Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Payment of Fee (Full Filing Fee, Installment Payment, Reopen)]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Schedule J-2]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Schedule J]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Notice of Hearing - Van002]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Dismiss Case - Other]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121-13
    Party Name:Damione T. Ward
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?640692

Post Your Comment or Question

7 x 2 =