Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Court Audio]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Hearing Scheduled]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Trustee Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Payment of Fee (Full Filing Fee, Installment Payment, Reopen)]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:January 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Appraisal]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120-13
    Party Name:Ronald Baugh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, (Acting) C. David [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?640691

Post Your Comment or Question

7 x 3 =