Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Chapter 13 341 Meeting Held]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Summary of Amendments to Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Regarding Objection to Confirmation of Plan (Withdrawl/Resolving/Consent)]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Withdrawal Of Objection To Confirmation]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Chapter 13 - Installment Payment (FINAL)]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Notice of Intent to Pay Claim]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Chapter 13 341 Meeting Continued/Reset]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chp 13]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Credit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Credit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Form B121 - Social Security Number or Individual Taxpayer Identification Number]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Submission of Tax Documents for Trustee]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Debtor Atty Fees (Chp 13 ONLY and ONLY for INITIAL FEES)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Form B121 - Social Security Number or Individual Taxpayer Identification Number]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Submission of Payment Advices for Trustee]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Submission of Tax Documents for Trustee]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Debtor Atty Fees (Chp 13 ONLY and ONLY for INITIAL FEES)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00121
    Party Name:James Glynn White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.alsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135105

Post Your Comment or Question

5 x 2 =