Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Continue ]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Findings and Recommendations]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order for PSI and Report]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Consent Form]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Plea]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [USM Return Executed]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Calendar Entry]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Information Sheet]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Filing Order]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment Unsealed]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:3:17-cr-00007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Caesar
    Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?115416

Post Your Comment or Question

8 x 2 =