Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (multi)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing]
    Date Published:January 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Notice of Hearing Set]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Form 122]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Form 122]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whiton, Molly T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-30027
    Party Name:Justin T. Smith
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ctb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?281855

Post Your Comment or Question

7 x 3 =