Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Vacate]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Form 122]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Form 122]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [none]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Connecticut
    Case Number:17-20205
    Party Name:Merari Vargas
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ctb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?282342

Post Your Comment or Question

2 x 1 =