Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
    Date Published:February 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Personal Financial Managment Course]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Show Cause Failure to Pay Installments]
    Date Published:February 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Show Cause Failure to Pay Installments]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Have the Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Schedules A/B-J]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Set First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Debtor Electronic Noticing (DeBN)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Debtor Electronic Noticing (DeBN)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:17-00015
    Party Name:Melvin Glasgow
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.dcb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?45690

Post Your Comment or Question

8 x 3 =