Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [(NO PAPER) - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [(NO PAPER) - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [Proof of Service]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Proof of Service]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [Mortgage Modification Mediation Order]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Mortgage Modification Mediation Order]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 29, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 29, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [Order Of Impending Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Order Of Impending Dismissal]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [Order Directing Immediate Payment of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Order Directing Immediate Payment of Filing Fee]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [Amended Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Amended Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [Receipt of Installment Payment (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select)]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Receipt of Installment Payment (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select)]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [Administrative Order FLMB-2016-1 Prescribing Procedures for Chapter 13 Cases]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Administrative Order FLMB-2016-1 Prescribing Procedures for Chapter 13 Cases]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [Notice Of Conversion, 341 Mtg. Date & Deadlines - To Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Notice Of Conversion, 341 Mtg. Date & Deadlines - To Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [Order Converting Case to Chapter 11/12/13]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Order Converting Case to Chapter 11/12/13]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [Notice Of Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202-
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patton,, Trustee Lori [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00202
    Party Name:Ajit Kumar Singh and Indira Singh
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Certificate Of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1224563

Post Your Comment or Question

4 x 2 =