Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Certificate Of Completion of Financial Management Course (or) Certificate of Debtor Education]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [(NO PAPER) - Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Administrative Order FLMB-2016-1 Prescribing Procedures for Chapter 13 Cases]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Certificate of Mailing Chapter 13/12 Plan Upon All or Additional Creditors]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 13]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Certificate Of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Statement of Social Security Numbers]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:6:17-bk-00164-
    Party Name:Joel Francois
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Weatherford, Laurie K [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1224561

Post Your Comment or Question

3 x 3 =