Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:12-38336-
    Party Name:Carlos Manuel Perez and Silvia Ivelisse Perez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Notice of Hearing by Filer]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:12-38336-
    Party Name:Carlos Manuel Perez and Silvia Ivelisse Perez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Reinstate Case]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:12-38336-
    Party Name:Carlos Manuel Perez and Silvia Ivelisse Perez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 04, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:12-38336-
    Party Name:Carlos Manuel Perez and Silvia Ivelisse Perez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Dismiss Case Non-Compliance Order]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:12-38336-
    Party Name:Carlos Manuel Perez and Silvia Ivelisse Perez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Report of Non-Compliance]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:12-38336-
    Party Name:Carlos Manuel Perez and Silvia Ivelisse Perez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Neidich, Nancy K. [Notice of Delinquency [Batch]]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.flsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?604706

Post Your Comment or Question

5 x 1 =