Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Close Bankruptcy Case - Chapter 7 with Trustee]
    Date Published:May 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (Required to receive discharge)]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [ADI - Deficiency Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Creditor Request for Notices (Creditor Filer - Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Ch 7 Trustee's NDR]
    Date Published:February 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Amended Schedules (No Fee)(A/B,C,G,H,I,J or Modify Creditor Address)]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Reaffirmation Agreement with SIGNED Certification by Debtor's Attorney]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Certification of Credit Counseling (must be obtained BEFORE filing date of petition)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)Credit Card (SYSTEM USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80042
    Party Name:Cynthia J Brummett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Covey, Charles E [Statement of SSN]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ilcb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135679

Post Your Comment or Question

1 x 3 =