Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [MNB Discharge of debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of debtor's prior filings]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Iannacone, Michael J [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-30054
    Party Name:Heather Lynn Luckett
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?434534

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 3 =