Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Discharge of debtor - Chapter 7]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Certificate of completion of financial management course]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Notice to debtor(s) re: financial management certification]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Reaffirmation agreement]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [BNC Certificate of mailing - Meeting of creditors]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Add creditor to matrix]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manty, Nauni Jo [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Certificate of credit counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Signature declaration (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Minnesota
    Case Number:17-40063
    Party Name:Sang Ngoc Nguyen
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [MNB Income records of Debtor (payment advices) (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.mnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?434537

Post Your Comment or Question

4 x 2 =