Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:12-03688-ee
    Party Name:Michael Lee Hall and Karen Faye Hall
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Henley, James L. [Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:12-03688-ee
    Party Name:Michael Lee Hall and Karen Faye Hall
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Henley, James L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:12-03688-ee
    Party Name:Michael Lee Hall and Karen Faye Hall
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Henley, James L. [Discharging Debtor(s) 13 AFTER plan completion]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:12-03688-ee
    Party Name:Michael Lee Hall and Karen Faye Hall
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Henley, James L. [Entry of Discharge (with certification and 21 day notice)]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:12-03688-ee
    Party Name:Michael Lee Hall and Karen Faye Hall
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Henley, James L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch 13 Requirements For Discharge]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:12-03688-ee
    Party Name:Michael Lee Hall and Karen Faye Hall
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Henley, James L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:12-03688-ee
    Party Name:Michael Lee Hall and Karen Faye Hall
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Henley, James L. [Notice of Completion of Plan Payments - Post BAPCPA]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi
    Case Number:12-03688-ee
    Party Name:Michael Lee Hall and Karen Faye Hall
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Henley, James L. [Release of Wages]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.mssb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?249804

Post Your Comment or Question

4 x 3 =