Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:13-41987-
    Party Name:Sirinha K. Philaphandet
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:February 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:13-41987-
    Party Name:Sirinha K. Philaphandet
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Discharging Debtor Chapter 13 (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:13-41987-
    Party Name:Sirinha K. Philaphandet
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:February 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:13-41987-
    Party Name:Sirinha K. Philaphandet
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Final Payment (Batch)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:13-41987-
    Party Name:Sirinha K. Philaphandet
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of RELEASING EMPLOYER (batch)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?152085

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 3 =