Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Close Automatically Dismissed Case]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Automatic Dismissal of Case]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account for a Dismissed Case (batch)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Case Automatically Dismissed with Notice of Automatic Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Judicial Determination of 521 Documents]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Request for Judicial Determination Re: 521 Documents]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Final Notice of Section 521 Deficiencies]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Final Notice of Section 521 Deficiencies]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Deficient Filing Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Request for Notice - Meeting of Creditors and Hearing on Confirmation Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 13) (Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of New York
    Case Number:1-17-40105-cec
    Party Name:Nasser Ahmad
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Macco, Michael J. [Prior Filings]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.nyeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?432678

Post Your Comment or Question

8 x 1 =