Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:11-23803-rdd
    Party Name:Scotty O. Richards and Doreen F. Carrasquillo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sapir-13, Jeffrey L. [Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:11-23803-rdd
    Party Name:Scotty O. Richards and Doreen F. Carrasquillo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sapir-13, Jeffrey L. [Discharge of Debtor (BNC)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:11-23803-rdd
    Party Name:Scotty O. Richards and Doreen F. Carrasquillo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sapir-13, Jeffrey L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Report of Completion of Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:11-23803-rdd
    Party Name:Scotty O. Richards and Doreen F. Carrasquillo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sapir-13, Jeffrey L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate Filed By Provider]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:11-23803-rdd
    Party Name:Scotty O. Richards and Doreen F. Carrasquillo
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Sapir-13, Jeffrey L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Requirement to Complete RFEOD and DSO (batch)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.nysb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?219591

Post Your Comment or Question

1 x 2 =