Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Angell, James B. [Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 7]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Angell, James B. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Angell, James B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Angell, James B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Angell, James B. [Statement of No Presumption of Abuse (batch)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Angell, James B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Angell, James B. [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Angell, James B. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Angell, James B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Angell, James B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-80014
    Party Name:Tina Marie Finn
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?202307

Post Your Comment or Question

5 x 1 =