Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Hearing Set (Reaffirmation Agreement)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:March 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:March 04, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Meeting of Creditors Held Chapter 7]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Notice of Requirement for Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Statement of No Presumption of Abuse (batch)]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lanik, James C. [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina
    Case Number:17-50028
    Party Name:Rolande E. Ellis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Form 21)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ncmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?202306

Post Your Comment or Question

5 x 3 =