Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:April 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Confirmation Hearing Not Held and/or Continued-CH 13 Trustee English ONLY]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Amended Order]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Withdrawal]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Meeting of Creditors Held - Virtual]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Appraisal of Property]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Transmission of Document to BNC for Service]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC]
    Date Published:January 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan - Prior to Confirmation]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Payroll Deduction Order]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: English, Faye D. [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:17-bk-50148
    Party Name:Toby Glass
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?741474

Post Your Comment or Question

3 x 1 =