Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stegner, Dennis [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stegner, Dennis [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stegner, Dennis [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stegner, Dennis [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stegner, Dennis [Auto Assignment (7 No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stegner, Dennis [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stegner, Dennis [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stegner, Dennis [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stegner, Dennis [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement 1015-2 with No Prior]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:17-bk-30076
    Party Name:Katherine L Sims
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?741468

Post Your Comment or Question

2 x 3 =