Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:April 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Docket]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:17-cv-00033
    Party Name:Earles v. Cleveland County Board of County Commissioners et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?98798

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 2 =