Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Discharge of Debtor]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Chapter 7 Initial Report]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Clerk's Notice of No Fees Due]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Notice to File Claims]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Interim Report]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Request for Notice to File Claims]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Request for Court Costs]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Reset]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [(1) Notice of Date of 341 Hearing (chp 7 & 12)]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [1 Relief from Stay and to Abandon]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10065
    Party Name:Beau Davis
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.okwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?289607

Post Your Comment or Question

8 x 3 =