Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10060
    Party Name:Jack Byron Dawson and Shirley J Dawson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Chapter 7 Trustee Report of No Distribution - no funds]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10060
    Party Name:Jack Byron Dawson and Shirley J Dawson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Reset]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10060
    Party Name:Jack Byron Dawson and Shirley J Dawson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [(1) Notice of Date of 341 Hearing (chp 7 & 12)]
    Date Published:January 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10060
    Party Name:Jack Byron Dawson and Shirley J Dawson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10060
    Party Name:Jack Byron Dawson and Shirley J Dawson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:17-10060
    Party Name:Jack Byron Dawson and Shirley J Dawson
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brown, Robert A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.okwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?289602

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 2 =