Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00138
    Party Name:CLAXTON v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00138
    Party Name:CLAXTON v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00138
    Party Name:CLAXTON v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00138
    Party Name:CLAXTON v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00138
    Party Name:CLAXTON v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00138
    Party Name:CLAXTON v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00138
    Party Name:CLAXTON v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00138
    Party Name:CLAXTON v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00138
    Party Name:CLAXTON v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00138
    Party Name:CLAXTON v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:17-cv-00138
    Party Name:CLAXTON v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al
    Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?525718

Post Your Comment or Question

2 x 3 =