Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Close Case]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:April 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Automatic Order Discharging Debtor (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (multi)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HOLBER, ROBERT H. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Matrix]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number (Form 121)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-10201-ref
    Party Name:Manuel Santiago Jimenez
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.paeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?468431

Post Your Comment or Question

6 x 2 =