Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-70020-
    Party Name:William A Venet, Sr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-70020-
    Party Name:William A Venet, Sr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Closed for No Asset Cases -multi-]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-70020-
    Party Name:William A Venet, Sr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-70020-
    Party Name:William A Venet, Sr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-70020-
    Party Name:William A Venet, Sr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-70020-
    Party Name:William A Venet, Sr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-70020-
    Party Name:William A Venet, Sr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice of Review of Bankruptcy Petition]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-70020
    Party Name:William A Venet, Sr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-70020
    Party Name:William A Venet, Sr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-70020
    Party Name:William A Venet, Sr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-70020
    Party Name:William A Venet, Sr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:17-70020
    Party Name:William A Venet, Sr.
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?343722

Post Your Comment or Question

5 x 3 =