Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Close Bankruptcy Case Without Discharge]
    Date Published:April 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Hearing Set/Cnt/Rsch (Preliminary)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Lift/Modify/Terminate Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Appearance and Request for Service Under BR 9010]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Uploaded Creditors]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Uploaded Creditors]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (IFP)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (IFP)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Case Opening]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:17-bk-20014
    Party Name:Donnie Lynn Isferding
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Case Opening]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?116820

Post Your Comment or Question

3 x 1 =