Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Closing Order: Discharge Trustee, Release Bond Liability & Close Case (Ch 7 No Asset Non-Image)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Discharging Debtor(s) (Chapter 7 or 11 Indiv.)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Installments Completed]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Payment of Fee (Full Filing Fee, Installment Payment, Reopen)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Notice of Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Appointing Trustee]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset-Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-80102-7
    Party Name:Anthony James Cooper
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell T [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?640690

Post Your Comment or Question

2 x 1 =