Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Final Order on Complaint]
    Date Published:October 06, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Vacate]
    Date Published:September 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Request for Telephonic Hearing]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Vacate/Set Aside]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Judgment]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing SET (With PDF if you want to use one)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Response]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Memorandum Re:]
    Date Published:June 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order Due (14 Day)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Filing Error - No Action Taken by Court]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing Set]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Pretrial Conference Set]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00003
    Party Name:Pratt et al v. West Virginia State Tax Department
    Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.alsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135106

Post Your Comment or Question

1 x 1 =