Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Final Decree 13/7]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Financial Management Course Due]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Chapter 13 341 Meeting Held]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Notice to Correct - 7 Days - Documents Overdue - (Notice to Debtor)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Notice to Correct - 4 Days - Documents Overdue - Virtual Entry]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 28, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Extend Time (Deadline to File Schedules)]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chp 13]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Debtor]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Credit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Credit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: O'Brien, Daniel B. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 - case upload]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:17-00120
    Party Name:Robert James Mullican
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 - case upload]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.alsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135104

Post Your Comment or Question

7 x 1 =