open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:19-70059-13
    Party Name:Clarence Ladell McCool
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Installments Completed]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Courtroom Deputy Notes (Public)]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Trustee's Report and Recommendation of Confirmation with Modifications]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Order and Notice of Deadline to Object to Confirmation]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Payment of Fee (Full Filing Fee, Installment Payment, Reopen)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Debtor(s) Information Change]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Notice to Show Cause]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Appraisal]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Cottingham, C David [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?668683
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =