open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:19-01020
    Party Name:The Bank of New York Mellon v. 251 Gotham LLC
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Set Hearing]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Order]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto)]
    Date Published:May 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order Reassigning Case Judge]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order Transferring Case from Another District - AP]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Brief]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition]
    Date Published:March 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Document Referred]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case as Frivolous]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Proposed Summons]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Order]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order - Document NOTED]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?63908
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =