Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:19-80407-7
    Party Name:Hunter Simpson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [Delay Discharge]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [Notice and Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset-Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [Appointing Trustee]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [Avoid Judicial Lien]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [Social Security-Form B121]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Shepard, Tazewell [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?669735
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =