open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Alabama
    Case Number:19-00546-7
    Party Name:Terri D. Daniels
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Closing Order: Discharge Trustee, Release Bond Liability & Close Case (Ch 7 No Asset Non-Image)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Discharging Debtor(s) (Chapter 7 or 11 Indiv.)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Installments Completed]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:June 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Payment of Fee (Full Filing Fee, Installment Payment, Reopen)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Notice to Show Cause]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Consent Order Lifting Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Social Security-Form B121]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset-Auto Assign)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Appointing Trustee]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Non-Image Order)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Notice of Deficient Filing and Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Notice to File Statement of SSN (B121) and/or Matrix]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Voluntary Petition Case Upload (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Henderson, James G [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Case Upload)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?669736
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =