open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00369
    Party Name:Legg v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service .....]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA (Social Security Action)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Proposed Summons]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motions Referred]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64968
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =