open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00371
    Party Name:McGee v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript (Social Security)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer (Social Security)]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service .....]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA (Social Security Action)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.alsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?64973
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =