open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

ALABAMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00577
    Party Name:Rowe v. Geneva County Commissioner et al (INMATE 1)
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to File Special Report]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?70527
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =