open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:14-ap-00951-
    Party Name:Metro Phoenix Bank, Inc. v. HALMAN, III et al
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Virtual Minute Entry]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Entry of Judgment / Order (Adv Form)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oJudgment]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Substitution of Attorney (Notice of)]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oStipulated Order]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Form (Adversary)]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oApproving]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Deposition (Notice of)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oScheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [o~Generic~ Order]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing on Objection (Notice of)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oAttorney Fees (Application for)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Objection]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reconsideration (Motion for)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Transcript and Notice of Filing (Form)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Service of Rule 26 Disclosures (Notice of)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Verified Statement]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Affidavit]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Attorney Fees (Application for)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Service of Discovery Requests (Notice of)]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Brief]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oSummary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Withdrawal (Notice of)]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Exceed Page Limit (Motion to)]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?684815
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =