open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:16-cv-08271
    Party Name:Thompson v. Lake Havasu City, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:April 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:February 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reset Cal Conflict - Hearing ]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:July 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:July 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Receiver]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:July 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:July 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Time Change Only - Hearing]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1009689
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =