open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:17-cv-03375
    Party Name:Griffith v. Apache Junction, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions]
    Date Published:August 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
    Date Published:July 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel ]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:May 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:May 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:May 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:March 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses]
    Date Published:February 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:December 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:December 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:November 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1056511
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =