open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-01801
    Party Name:Mohiuddin et al v. Apache Junction, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Allow Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:October 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:October 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference ]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP]
    Date Published:September 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery]
    Date Published:August 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for TRO ]
    Date Published:June 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Temporary Restraining Order]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1104072
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =