open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:18-cv-04233
    Party Name:Anderson et al v. Surprise, City of
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1138888
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =