Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-bk-02842-PS
    Party Name:JAMES LEROY SMITH, JR. and LINDA LURENE SMITH
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oDismiss Case]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Dismiss Case (Motion to)]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oApproving]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oExtend]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Extend (Motion to)]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Stipulation]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Appearance (Notice of)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency/Warning Notc to Atty for No Declaration of Electronic Filing (Form)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oExtend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13 (Initial)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (310.00 fee)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?754828
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =