open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-bk-02841-
    Party Name:SUSAN MAZZOTTI
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Close Bankruptcy Case (BKM)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:July 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [oRelief from Stay]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
    Date Published:May 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (181.00 fee)]
    Date Published:May 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:April 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?754827
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =