Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-bk-04751-
    Party Name:ROBERT S ANTUS
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Final Report - Dismissed Case (Chapter 13) (batch)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Objection to Exempt Property (batch)]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Initial Mailing List]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice to Pro Se Debtors Form]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [ID Requested, Identity Confirmed Filed by Non Debtor]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oPay Filing Fee (Previous Unpaid Fee) - VAN Form]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756805
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =