open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-bk-04749-
    Party Name:JENNIFER K FISHER
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Close Bankruptcy Case (BKM)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (335.00 fee)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756803
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =