Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:19-bk-04746-
    Party Name:BRIANNA RENEE CORRAL
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:May 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oWaiving Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Judge Order)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--341 Notice (ADI)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Initial Mailing List]
    Date Published:April 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice to Pro Se Debtors Form]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:April 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?756800
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =