open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02543
    Party Name:Konieczny v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA ]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Submitted]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1170149
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =