open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:19-mj-60823-1
    Party Name:USA v. Marcia-Martinez
  • Filing Type:[Judgment and Commitment Issued/Judgment of Probation Issued]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Plea Agreement ]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Plea and Sentence (Text Only)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Extension of Time to Indict ]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Interpreter Language (Calendars)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1170102
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =